Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 711 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4259 Week
» 5149 Month
» 313130 Year
» 1197511 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80087   29/06/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 29/06/1954 to Bury (26D)
Withdrawal Sun 14/06/1964
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 9 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26D Bury (New) 29/06/1954
6H Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
75E Three Bridges 5w/e 31/12/1959
73F Ashford m/e 31/01/1960
75E Three Bridges 3w/e 26/05/1961
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 17/12/1962
70C Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1963
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn 14/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26D Bury 03/07/1954
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 17/12/1962
ALLOC 70C Guildford 3w/e 01/04/1963
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/06/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 80087
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bury (26D)
   
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
14/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80087    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev