Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 293 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4031 Week
» 1544 Month
» 229428 Year
» 1450993 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80145 on 16/10/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 16/10/1956 to Brighton (75A)
Withdrawal Sun 25/06/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
75A Brighton (New) 16/10/1956
75B Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70E Salisbury 4w/e 08/06/1965
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 07/02/1966
   Withdrawn 25/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75A Brighton 16/10/1956
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
TOSTORE 70E Salisbury P 06/06/1965
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 07/02/1966
WDN   w/e 25/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/11/1961 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. SLS/196112
31/05/1964 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard, Waiting Works: 73050, 73083. Works Yard, Ex Works: 34089, 73114. Erecting Shop: 30069, 32640, 32678 Undergoing restoration, 34005, 34018, 34026, 34037, 34042, 34076, 35007, 35019 35022/3, 73052, 73085/9, 76067, 76082, 80016, 80145, 80154, 15218, 15233, 20002, D3041, D3220, D3459, D3667, D6547, D6554. Scrap Yard: 30133 Intact, 34049 Remains, 82008 Intact. SLS/196407

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/10/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80145
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Brighton (75A)
   
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
07/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
25/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80145    

prev prev