Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 238 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5582 Week
» 6472 Month
» 314453 Year
» 1198834 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82001   18/04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 18/04/1952 to Tyseley (84E)
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 13 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84E Tyseley (New) 18/04/1952
84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/05/1953
88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 16/07/1955
88F Treherbert 4w/e 06/10/1956
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 22/03/1958
6E Chester West 4w/e 09/08/1958
6A Chester (MR) w/e 09/04/1960
82G Templecombe (S&D) w/e 22/04/1961
86C Hereford 4w/e 08/09/1962
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 04/05/1963
83B Taunton 4w/e 28/12/1963
82E Bristol Barrow Road 7w/e 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 19/04/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 30/04/1952
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/04/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 31/12/1963
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 3w/e 29/06/1964
TOSTORE   3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/04/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 82001
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (86C)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 82001    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev