Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 253 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7713 Week
» 5226 Month
» 233110 Year
» 1454675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 82023 on 22/10/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 3 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 398
To Service Sun 22/10/1954 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal Sun 02/10/1966
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) 22/10/1954
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
   Withdrawn 02/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 31/10/1954
NEW NYA   m/e 31/10/1954
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/11/1962
WDN   w/e 02/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1963 Eastligh MPD (Ex Works) Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/10/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 82023
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
02/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 82023    

prev prev