Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1186 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14592 Week
» 67608 Month
» 187135 Year
» 3213988 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8430 |
on |
08/01/1953 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
2940 |
To Service |
Thu 08/01/1953 to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
Withdrawal |
Thu 02/05/1963 |
Service Life |
10 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/01/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
04/05/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/01/1953 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8430 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2940 Allocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
02/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8430 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|