Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 85 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3684 Week
» 9818 Month
» 237702 Year
» 1459267 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8434 on 28/02/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder W.G. Bagnall
Order Number Unk
Works Number 2944
To Service Mon 28/02/1953 to Old Oak Common (81A)
Withdrawal Mon 15/06/1959
Scrapping During 12/1960 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 6 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81A Old Oak Common (New) 28/02/1953
   Withdrawn 15/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1947
NEW NYA   m/e 28/02/1953
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 21/03/1953
WDN   m/e 30/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/02/1953 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8434
Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2944
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
   
15/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 8434    

prev prev