Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14314 Week
» 67330 Month
» 186857 Year
» 3213710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8440 |
on |
04/03/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
1STALLOC |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
ALLOC |
86B |
Newport Pill |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
86F |
Aberbeeg |
4w/e |
22/04/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/03/1954 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8440 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2950 Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86F) |
|
|
13/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8440 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|