Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 376 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3975 Week
» 10109 Month
» 237993 Year
» 1459558 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8442 on 31/03/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder W.G. Bagnall
Order Number Unk
Works Number 2952
To Service Mon 31/03/1954 to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)
Withdrawal Mon 15/06/1959
Scrapping During 12/1960 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 5 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87A Neath (Court Sart) (New) 31/03/1954
   Withdrawn 15/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 27/03/1954
WDN   m/e 30/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/03/1954 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8442
Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2952
Allocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)
   
15/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 8442    

prev prev