|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/03/1962 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/07/1952 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 8489 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 1836 Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
||
09/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) | ||
21/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) | ||
30/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) | ||
04/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
09/02/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 8489 | ||
04/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |