Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 203 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6410 Week
» 3923 Month
» 231807 Year
» 1453372 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8701 m/e 02/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6681
To Service During 02/1931
Withdrawal During 03/1963
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 32 yrs , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1931
85C Hereford 7w/e 31/08/1952
85D Kidderminster 4w/e 21/02/1959
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 18/04/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 18/04/1959
WDN   4w/e 06/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8701
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6681
   
31/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 8701    

prev prev