Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 217 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7677 Week
» 5190 Month
» 233074 Year
» 1454639 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8719 m/e 03/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6699
To Service During 03/1931
Withdrawal During 05/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1931
83B Taunton 4w/e 12/06/1958
83E St Blazey 4w/e 24/01/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 83E St Blazey m/e 28/02/1959
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. SLS/194605
24/03/1946 Stock Returns No. 92 which has been shown as withdrawn, was transferred to Wellingon in October 1938 and is still there. On 2/3 it appeared to be 100 per cent. intact but for the coupling rods. Assuming that the date of its withdrawal from service coincided with its conversion to a stationary boiler, the official date of 8/42 must be questioned for it has been functioning as such at least since the summer of 1941. No: 92 is not the only locomotive to be so employed, for 1287, which was withdrawn on 9/9/39 and subsequently reinstated, is at Leamington. However although employed for the ,same purpose as 92, and in the same condition, it still remains on the capital list. Mr. Seddon would be grateful for any information as to when 1287 first appeared at Leamington, for how long she was at work as a motive unit and also as to the last time that 92 was actively engaged at Wellington. Regarding the latter this will be co-related with the first appearance there of L.M.S. saddle tank 16027, which is permanently on loan from 4A. 3573/80 shown in the stock returns as 2-4-0T should be entered as 0-4-2T and the relevant totals altered accordingly. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. SLS/194605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8719
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6699
   
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 8719    

prev prev