Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 235 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 6469 Month
» 314450 Year
» 1198831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8722 m/e 04/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal During 04/1961
Scrapping During 09/1961 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 30 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 19/06/1954
85A Worcester 4w/e 10/08/1957
85C Hereford 4w/e 09/08/1958
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 18/06/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 18/06/1960
WDN   m/e 30/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as GWR Number 8722
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
   
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 8722    
09/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev