Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1021 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8481 Week
» 5994 Month
» 233878 Year
» 1455443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8723 m/e 04/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6703
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1931
16 Aberbeeg 4w/e 01/12/1945
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 16/06/1962
88J Aberdare 4w/e 09/02/1963
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/03/1963
88J Aberdare 4w/e 04/05/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABEEG Aberbeeg 4w/e 01/12/1945
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil m/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 04/05/1963
WDN   w/e 08/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8723
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6703
   
01/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (16)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 8723    

prev prev