Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 126 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4941 Week
» 11075 Month
» 238959 Year
» 1460524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 8724 m/e 04/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6704
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal During 07/1962
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1931
ABEEG Aberbeeg 8w/e 23/03/1946
86J Aberdare 4w/e 31/10/1953
87C Danygraig 4w/e 06/11/1954
87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 28/11/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABEEG Aberbeeg 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 87C Danygraig 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1949 Swindon Works New Work January: Nos. 6996 Blackwell Hall (RDG (4/1)), 6997 Bryn-Ivor Hall (17/1), 6998 Burton Agnes Hall (28/1); 6769 BRY (6/1). Locomotives entering Works 30/12/48 to 28/1/49: These included Nos. p24 (Petrol), 213/46 (Both acting as Works' pilots), 1007/08/19, 1369, 1426/29, 2016 (open cab), 2235/64/94, 2445, 2807/59, 2843, 2942/79/87, 3020/44, 3631/33, 3751, 3811/57 (damaged), 3818/28/55, 4017/41/46/53/59/74/78/79/86, 4122/37, 4225/82,, 4507/10/50/94, 4601, 4801 (Ex-Carriage Stock Shed-for conversion to coal-burning), 4912/15/21/35/58, 5014/27/29/49/57/61/92/93, 5108/34, 5225, 5307/33/48/58, 5502/05/12/31/53/72, 5909/49/61/97 , 6013/23/29, 6104/38/58/66, 6304/07/32/34/59/81, 6432, 6640, 6802/03/64/65/69, 6967, 7412, 7731/62/66/86/87, 7805, 8724/26, 9604/11/53, 9732/53/69, W.D. 77049 (badly damaged), 79279, 79309. Condemned: Nos. *1538, *1713, 2717 (all to Concentration Yard), 1889/97, 2767 (open cab), 2935, 3049, 3446/48, 4320. *After acting as Works' pilot.
Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, include Nos. 4900, 5997, 6930/39, while No. 2166 came out black and unlined-with the original boiler again. No. 3020 has had a heavy repair (with a change of boiler), fitted with a smokebox numberplate, but not re-painted
SLS/194903

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8724
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6704
   
23/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (ABEEG)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Danygraig (87C)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 8724    

prev prev