Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4067 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17473 Week
» 70489 Month
» 190016 Year
» 3216869 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8731 |
m/e |
02/1931 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2428 |
To Service |
During 02/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/07/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8731 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2428 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
30/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
13/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8731 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|