Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 8 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17811 Week
» 70827 Month
» 190354 Year
» 3217207 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92200 |
on |
18/11/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92200 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
03/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92200 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |
|
|