Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 129 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4944 Week
» 11078 Month
» 238962 Year
» 1460527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92209 on 26/06/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 26/06/1959 to Laira (83D)
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 6 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR1G 1516 26/06/1959 BR 5,000g 7t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83D Laira (New) 26/06/1959
82B St Philips Marsh (on loan) m/e 07/1959
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 05/09/1959
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 20/05/1961
88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 28/09/1963
81C Southall 4w/e 13/06/1965
88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 11/07/1965
82E Bristol Barrow Road 7w/e 07/11/1965
   Withdrawn 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1959
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 13/06/1965
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 11/07/1965
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 08/08/1965
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 7w/e 07/11/1965
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/06/1959 Diagram BR9 boiler fitted (number BR9-1884)


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/06/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92209
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
Tender fitted: BR1G
Diagram BR9 boiler fitted
   
07/1959 Allocation Loaned to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
07/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
31/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92209    

prev prev