Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 115 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 115 Week
» 6249 Month
» 234133 Year
» 1455698 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92212 on 30/09/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 30/09/1959 to Banbury (84C)
Withdrawal Tue 30/01/1968
Service Life 8 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84C Banbury (New) 30/09/1959
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 17/06/1961
84E Tyseley 4w/e 14/07/1962
10A Carnforth 29/10/1966
   Withdrawn 30/01/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1959
1STALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 06/01/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/11/1959 Banbury MPD With the increased traffic occasioned by the transfer of Wolverhampton-Birmingham-London trains from the LMR, this shed has acquired three Castles viz. 4078, 5057 an 7011 i.e. including Banbury Castle. Crewe's last steam engine (92250) has been transferred away to Newport (86A) but additional 9Fs ex Swindon Works have been allocated viz. 92211/2/3. SLS/196001
12/11/1961 Swindon Works (Works Sidings) 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. SLS/196201
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
12/08/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. SLS/196409
27/06/1965 Crewe Works (Side of Works) Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. SLS/196508

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92212
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Banbury (84C)
   
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
29/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
30/01/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 92212    

prev prev