Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1112 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 8119 Week
» 14253 Month
» 242137 Year
» 1463702 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92246 on 31/12/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Fri 31/12/1958 to Old Oak Common (81A)
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 7 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81A Old Oak Common (New) 31/12/1958
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 05/11/1960
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
81C Southall 4w/e 30/11/1963
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 6w/e 19/09/1965
85B Gloucester Horton Road 7w/e 07/11/1965
   Withdrawn 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
1STALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/11/1958
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1958
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 5w/e 19/09/1965
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 7w/e 07/11/1965
TOSTORE   3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/12/1962 Cardiff East Dock MPD There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. SLS/196302
18/08/1963 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Triangle: 1432, 6437, 5679, 8444/86/91/94/96, 8766, 9401/79/83, 9715, D3103. Yard: 1621, 3668, 3711, 3826, 4082, 4175, 4265/98, 5645, 5933, 6011/25/26, 6159, 6815/19/28/35, 6931/32/61/78, 7909, 8738, 9412/40. 'A' Shop: D1023-26 (New in various stages of construction), D603, D801/4/40/61/2, D1004/9/16/9/50/63, D6305, D7075, 3605, 3738, 3850, 4115/57/68, 5971, 6000/18, 6129/65, 6809/15/37/68, 6937/44/78/94, 7902/27, 8403, 9662, 92246, Birmingham Pullman, uW60096. Top end of 'A' Shop: 15100/1/3, D3509/94/95, D3195, D3600, and N.C.B. 0-6-2 T. 67 (ex T.V.R.). Dismantling Shed: 5644, 5945. Dump: 3795, 4074, 5101/92, 5201, 5912/31, 7;412, 8783/91, 9713. Weigh House: D604, D808, 3823. On shed ex-Works: 9607, 9666. In store on shed: 1019, 2250, 2890, 3780, 3842, 4079, 4631, 4909, 4948, 5017, 5357, 5525/70, 5815, 5943, 9604 an W21. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92246
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
   
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
07/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92246    

prev prev