Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2052 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19855 Week
» 72871 Month
» 192398 Year
» 3219251 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92250 |
on |
31/12/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/11/1959 |
Banbury MPD |
With the increased traffic occasioned by the transfer of Wolverhampton-Birmingham-London trains from the LMR, this shed has acquired three Castles viz. 4078, 5057 an 7011 i.e. including Banbury Castle. Crewe's last steam engine (92250) has been transferred away to Newport (86A) but additional 9Fs ex Swindon Works have been allocated viz. 92211/2/3. |
SLS/196001 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92250 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
07/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
31/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92250 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|