Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 5 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5349 Week
» 6239 Month
» 314220 Year
» 1198601 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9409 m/e 05/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1947
Withdrawal During 05/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 15 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81C Southall 4w/e 28/02/1951
81E Didcot 4w/e 03/12/1955
81C Southall 4w/e 28/01/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW PDN Old Oak Common m/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC 81C Southall m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1947 To Service To service as GWR Number 9409
Built at Swindon Works
   
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 9409    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev