Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9410 |
on |
03/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
7547 |
To Service |
Fri 03/02/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/07/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
88C |
Barry |
m/e |
28/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
81D |
Reading (W.R.) |
4w/e |
20/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/02/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9410 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7547 |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
13/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9410 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|