Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1687 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15093 Week
» 68109 Month
» 187636 Year
» 3214489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9411 |
on |
28/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
7548 |
To Service |
Thu 28/02/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/06/1965 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
88C |
Barry |
m/e |
28/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
81D |
Reading (W.R.) |
4w/e |
20/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
12/04/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
13/06/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/10/1962 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works |
1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. |
SLS/196211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/02/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9411 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7548 |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
03/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9411 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|