Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1835 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19638 Week
» 72654 Month
» 192181 Year
» 3219034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9421 |
on |
07/07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
7558 |
To Service |
Mon 07/07/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/02/1962 |
Service Life |
11 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
07/07/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/02/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/07/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
28/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/07/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9421 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7558 |
|
|
12/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9421 |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|