Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1207 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19010 Week
» 72026 Month
» 191553 Year
» 3218406 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9424 |
on |
03/08/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
4w/e |
10/09/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/08/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9424 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7561 Allocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
29/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9424 |
|
|