Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 323 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 323 Week
» 7507 Month
» 315488 Year
» 1199869 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9427   30/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service Sun 30/09/1950
Withdrawal During 06/1959
Scrapping During 12/1960 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 8 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 28/02/1951
86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 26/12/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC NYA   4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 26/12/1953
WDN   m/e 30/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 9427
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 9427    
12/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev