Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1435 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19238 Week
» 72254 Month
» 191781 Year
» 3218634 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9439 |
on |
13/02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
7576 |
To Service |
Mon 13/02/1951 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1959 |
Service Life |
8 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
13/02/1951 |
83C |
|
Exeter |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
83C |
|
Exeter |
4w/e |
31/03/1951 |
83C |
|
Exeter |
4w/e |
21/04/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/06/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
83C |
Exeter |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
83C |
Exeter |
4w/e |
21/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/02/1951 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9439 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7576 |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
15/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9439 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|