Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9441 |
on |
09/03/1951 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/03/1951 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9441 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7578 Allocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
30/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
20/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9441 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|