Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2544 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15950 Week
» 68966 Month
» 188493 Year
» 3215346 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9451 |
on |
25/07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
7588 |
To Service |
Fri 25/07/1951 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/07/1962 |
Service Life |
10 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
ALLOC |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/07/1951 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9451 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7588 |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
31/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
13/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9451 |
|
|
10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|