Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2455 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15861 Week
» 68877 Month
» 188404 Year
» 3215257 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9456 |
on |
21/09/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
7593 |
To Service |
Wed 21/09/1951 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 08/04/1964 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
21/09/1951 |
87B |
|
Duffryn Yard |
8w/e |
03/11/1951 |
88B |
|
Radyr |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/04/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
30/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
8w/e |
03/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
2w/e |
13/04/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/09/1951 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9456 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7593 |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
08/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9456 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|