Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 892 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14298 Week
» 67314 Month
» 186841 Year
» 3213694 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9461 |
on |
31/12/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
7612 |
To Service |
Fri 31/12/1951 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 07/05/1965 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
ALLOC |
88L |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
5w/e |
02/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
3w/e |
14/09/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
5w/e |
16/05/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1951 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9461 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7612 |
|
|
31/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
07/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9461 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|