|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/07/1961 | Stafford Road Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 1455, 2217, 3210, 3610, 3792, 4110/20, 4290, 4703, 4910/96, 5416, 5563/8/70, 5679, 5957, 6611/68, 7308/39, 7403, 8403, 9464, 9674, 9778. Weigh House : D3034, 1011. Works Yard: 1003/7, 2249, 3201, 3618, 4591, 5548, 5694, 5933, 6314, 6424, 6688, 7244, 73037. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/01/1952 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 9464 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7615 Allocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
04/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
13/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
07/02/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Radyr (88B) | ||
03/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9464 | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |