Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9616   28/09/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 28/09/1945
Withdrawal During 08/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 19 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86 Llantrisant 4w/e 03/11/1945
NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport) 8w/e 23/03/1946
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LTS Llantrisant 4w/e 03/11/1945
ALLOC NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 23/03/1946
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   25/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1945 To Service To service as GWR Number 9616
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Llantrisant (86)    
23/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT )    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9616    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev