Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 152 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4967 Week
» 11101 Month
» 238985 Year
» 1460550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9623 on 08/11/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 355
To Service Wed 08/11/1945
Withdrawal Wed 21/07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 08/11/1945
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 10/09/1960
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
   Withdrawn 21/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1945
NEW TN Taunton m/e 30/11/1945
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
WDN   w/e 25/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/01/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works 1017(89A), 1639, 1650, 3200, 3622, 3631, 3831, 4154, 4270(88A), 4555(83A), 4645, 4663, 4946(89A), 5254(87B), 5658, 5957(81F), 6125, 6137, 6326, 6976/9, 7248, 7329, 7439, 8753(81C), 9612/23/46, 82041, 92227(88A). Works Yard: 2287(89C), D3028, D3979. Waiting Works: 3708(86G), 4179(84A), 4608(81C), 6150(81F), 6972(82B), 6992(85A), 75024(84E). SLS/196203
04/03/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 1011 (82B), 2287 (89C), 3622, 3677 (82B), 3692 (87B), 3708 (86G), 3833 (86A), 4122 (87H), 4179, 4696, 5774, 5901/77, 6110, 6125 (87H), 6137/50, 6326 (88A), 6972 (82B), 6974/6/92, 7200 (87F), 7236, 7804 (87G), 9623 (82B), 9782, 75024, 92227 (88A). Works Yard: 1451 (83C), 2268 (82D), 2856, 4140, 4608, 7807 (89D), 9633 (83C), D3037, D3977. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/11/1945 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9623
Built at Swindon Works
   
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9623    

prev prev