Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1347 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19150 Week
» 72166 Month
» 191693 Year
» 3218546 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
826 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
70826 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3055 |
on |
04/02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63055 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
British Railways |
90055 |
m/e |
06/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/11/1953 |
Darlington Works |
North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. |
SLS/195402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 826 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25168 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70826 |
|
|
04/02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3055 |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63055 |
|
|
30/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90055 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
14/03/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90055 |
|
|
06/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|