Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1023 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14429 Week
» 67445 Month
» 186972 Year
» 3213825 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
844 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
War Dept. |
70844 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3065 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63065 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
British Railways |
90065 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 844 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24917 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70844 |
|
|
04/01/1946 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Colwick (CLK) (On loan from WD) |
|
|
26/10/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3065 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63065 |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90065 |
|
|
01/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Woodford Halse (2G) (Boundary change - loco remained at Woodford, by now LMR, on loan from ER) |
|
|
28/03/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90065 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|