Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2633 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16039 Week
» 69055 Month
» 188582 Year
» 3215435 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
870 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
War Dept. |
70870 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3073 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63073 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90073 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 870 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25412 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70870 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3073 |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63073 |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90073 |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
13/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
27/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90073 |
|
|
08/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath |
|
|