Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9728 m/e 12/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 12/1934
Withdrawal During 05/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 27 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
6A Chester (MR) w/e 09/04/1960
88E Abercynon w/e 21/05/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 21/05/1960
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/05/1960
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1934 To Service To service as GWR Number 9728
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 9728    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev