Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2688 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16094 Week
» 69110 Month
» 188637 Year
» 3215490 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7006 |
m/e |
02/1943 |
War Dept. |
77006 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90106 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7006 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24977 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77006 |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90106 |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90106 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|