28/02/1946 |
Crewe - Smoke deflectors |
Smoke deflectors are being fitted to all the non-streamlined Princess Coronation locos in the same way as with 6232/52. 6234/3/50 have so far been so treated. |
SLS/194605 |
30/03/1946 |
W.D. ENGINES IN HOLLAND |
The initials N.S. indicates Nederlandsche Spoorwegen, i.e. Netherlands Railways: this being not a State to concern but a limited liability company. Reference to the Netherlands State Railways is thus incorrect. Another point is that all W.D. locos in Holland are on to loan and have not been purchased. They still have their W.D. numbers in addition to their N.S numbers. Six more 0-6-0 saddle tanks are on loan:-N.S. 8822 to 8827, W.D. 75026/53/86, 75104/15/99. The 2-8-0's (W.D. 77125, 77238) which were allotted N.S. 4528/9 were in an accident last August, and were sent to Malines Works in Belgium. After overhaul, they went to to Western Germany, and so never bore their N.S. numbers. Ten more W.D. 2 8 0's went to the N.S. on loan in January, 1946:-N.S. 4528 to 4537, W.D. 77009/10, 77193/4/7, 77011/38, 77188/90, 77358. Of these, 77193/4/7 came from the Dutch State Mines in Limburg. At the same time N.S. 4511 (W.D. 79196) went to the State Mines (S.M.), while N.S. 4504/9 (W.D. 78677 and 79189) left for Belgium. These three locos. are no longer on the N.S. list. W.D. 77193 was S.M. 62. Also noted S.M. 74 (W.D. 75002). Sixty 2-10-0's are on loan to the N.S. from January, 1946:-N.S. 5001 to 5060: W.D. 73650/61/2/4-71/3/5/6/9-81/9-93/5-9, 73700/1/4-7/9/11-3/5/7-22/7/9/32-4/6-41/4/5/7-9. |
SLS/194605 |
15/10/1951 |
Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering |
Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. |
SLS/195111 |
10/03/1963 |
Goole MPD (Stripping Shop) |
Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. |
SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Stripping Shop) |
New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. |
SLS/196304 |