Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2860 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16266 Week
» 69282 Month
» 188809 Year
» 3215662 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7034 |
m/e |
04/1943 |
War Dept. |
77034 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90130 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/03/1962 |
Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7034 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25005 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77034 |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90130 |
|
|
10/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
13/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
17/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90130 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|