|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/10/1951 | Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering | Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. | SLS/195111 |
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) | Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. | SLS/195206 |
13/08/1967 | Sunderland MPD | On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. | SLS/196709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/05/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7040 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25011 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77040 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) | ||
30/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) | ||
02/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) | ||
06/1952 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90135 | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Goole (25C) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
24/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
07/03/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
17/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
31/12/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90135 | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |