30/09/1947 |
Brighton Works |
Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. |
SLS/194710 |
12/08/1950 |
S.R. Renumbering |
The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. |
SLS/195012 |
28/02/1951 |
Southern Region WD\'s |
There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. |
SLS/195104 |
05/05/1951 |
Brighton Works |
42093 nearly finished by 5th May, 42094/5 an 80010-3 in various stages. 80010 is due out during the latter half of June, the next three being due in July. 2009 has been cut up and 32022 an 2062 are being dealt with next, followed by 2063 an 2068. All the 2-8-0 rernaining on SR register are re-numbered with the exception of 77150 (73C). . |
SLS/195106 |
12/05/1951 |
Ashford Works |
In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. |
SLS/195107 |
20/05/1951 |
Locos renumbered |
S.R. 2170 was renumbered 32170 in mid-May, and diesel sl will shortly be turned out as 15201. Thus the S.R. diesels have become 15201-15203 instead of 15200-15202 as originally ordained. The Southern Region has lost two more W.D., 2-8-0 to the L.M.R., 90226 from 73B and 90390 from 73C. No. 77150 has now become 90142, so that all remaining on the S.R. are now renumbered with the possible exception of 77226 (90194). |
SLS/195107 |