Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2110 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19913 Week
» 72929 Month
» 192456 Year
» 3219309 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7277 |
m/e |
08/1944 |
War Dept. |
77277 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3077 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63077 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
British Railways |
90077 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. |
SLS/194704 |
12/06/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Being scrapped) |
In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. |
SLS/196307 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7277 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25148 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77277 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3077 |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63077 |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90077 |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
02/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
08/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carstairs (66E) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
06/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90077 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|