Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 155 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 155 Week
» 14412 Month
» 242296 Year
» 1463861 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9773 m/e 03/1936

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 293
To Service During 03/1936
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 29 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1936
81F Oxford w/e 08/11/1964
   Withdrawn 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81F Oxford 3w/e 02/11/1964
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1936 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9773
Built at Swindon Works
   
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9773    

prev prev