Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1671 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15077 Week
» 68093 Month
» 187620 Year
» 3214473 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7305 |
m/e |
04/1943 |
War Dept. |
77305 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90221 |
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MAR |
March |
on |
31/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
31/01/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7305 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25175 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77305 |
|
|
31/07/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90221 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
31/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90221 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |
|
|