Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1193 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18996 Week
» 72012 Month
» 191539 Year
» 3218392 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7363 |
m/e |
09/1943 |
War Dept. |
77363 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3018 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63018 |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90018 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1943 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
25/02/1961 |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/04/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
04/03/1961 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
08/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
5w/e |
07/10/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/04/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7363 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25231 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77363 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3018 |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63018 |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90018 |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
17/04/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90018 |
|
|
08/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|