Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3480 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16886 Week
» 69902 Month
» 189429 Year
» 3216282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7365 |
m/e |
09/1943 |
War Dept. |
77365 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90260 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1943 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
w/e |
01/09/1951 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
25C |
|
Goole |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/09/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
on |
12/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
01/09/1951 |
LOAN |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
ALLOC |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
30/11/1947 |
WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport |
|
In L.N.E.R. Shops
|
|
Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/08/1947 |
Darlington Works |
The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7365 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25236 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77365 |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90260 |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|
02/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90260 |
|
|