Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2072 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19875 Week
» 72891 Month
» 192418 Year
» 3219271 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7424 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
War Dept. |
77424 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90293 |
m/e |
09/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/10/1951 |
Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering |
Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. |
SLS/195111 |
18/03/1962 |
Gorton MPD |
On Shed ex-Works : 63704/64, 90293/305/68. |
SLS/196204 |
10/10/1965 |
Doncaster Shed (Stored) |
Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. |
SLS/196511 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7424 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25152 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77424 |
|
|
19/06/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
09/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90293 |
|
|
10/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
26/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90293 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|