Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4011 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17417 Week
» 70433 Month
» 189960 Year
» 3216813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7425 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
War Dept. |
77425 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90294 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1944 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
MAR |
|
March |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
40B |
|
Immingham |
4w/e |
24/10/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
11/07/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MAR |
March |
on |
15/08/1947 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/04/1947 |
Stonor Dump |
A visit to the 'dump' at Stonor on 14/4 found only six of the original 110 2-8-0 engines remaining. These were 77076, 77337, 77425, 77457, 78682 and 79184. Of these, 77457 would appear to be the next to leave, as it had been moved up near to the S.R. line, while 78682 does not appear to have moved from the position it occupied last June. All six were dirty, rusty and appeared to be in need of repair, and three of them (77076, 77337 and 79184) had had their builders' plates taken away. The Nissen type engine shed close by the main Ramsgate-Sandwich road was occupied by W.D. 0-6-0 ST. No. 75110, which was in steam. |
SLS/194706 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7425 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25153 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77425 |
|
|
13/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90294 |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90294 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|